Ian tuxworth
Webb1 juni 1985 · Footnotes 1 Northern Territory Government, Ian Tuxworth Ministry , 21 December 1984. Journal. Australian Journal of Public Administration – Wiley. Published: Jun 1, 1985. Recommended Articles. Loading... There are no references for this article. You’re reading a ... WebbOne of the government men opposed to the handback of Uluru to traditional owners three decades ago now accepts it has been a success. In the lead up to the 1985 ceremony, …
Ian tuxworth
Did you know?
Webb1 jan. 2016 · Mr Tuxworth said he was proud of his government's work to develop the Mereenie and Palm Valley gas fields, which saw the Territory's cities and towns shift … WebbIan Tuxworth is Former Board Member at Harvest Living Ltd. See Ian Tuxworth's compensation, career history, education, & memberships.
WebbIan Lindsay Tuxworth is an Australian politician, who was Chief Minister of the Northern Territory of Australia from 17 October 1984 until he resigned on 10 May 1986. Webb22 jan. 2024 · Mr Tuxworth was a member of the Northern Territory’s first Ministry following the declaration of Self Government in 1978 and served as the Northern Territory’s second Chief Minister from October 1984 to May 1986.
WebbIan Lindsay Tuxworth (18 June 1942 – 21 January 2024) was an Australian politician, who was Chief Minister of the Northern Territory of Australia from 17 October 1984 until his … Webb22 jan. 2024 · Ian Tuxworth; 1987 Northern Territory general election; List of Australian heads of government by time in office; List of chief ministers of the Northern Territory by …
WebbChief Minister of the Northern Territory — Ian Tuxworth (until 10 May), then Stephen Hatton. Opposition Leader — Bob Collins (until 19 August), then Terry Smith; Chief Minister/President of the Legislative Assembly of Norfolk Island — David Buffett (until 21 May), then John Brown; Governors and Administrators
Webb22 jan. 2024 · Mr Tuxworth was a member of the Northern Territory’s first Ministry following the declaration of Self Government in 1978 and served as the Northern … mocks aceipmWebbJohn Tuxworth elected new Club President after Bob Dwyer announced his resignation from the position. The 97 th Annual General Meeting of the Randwick District Rugby … inline speditionWebbMedia in category "Ian Tuxworth" The following 4 files are in this category, out of 4 total. Borroloola Airport.jpg. Ian Tuxworth, NT Chief Minister (cropped).jpg 387 × 488; 27 … mock salary negotiationWebbIan Lindsay Tuxworth (born 18 June 1942) is an Australian politician, who was Chief Minister of the Northern Territory of Australia from 17 October 1984 until he resigned on … in-line spectrophotometerWebbIan Tuxworth: 972 50.5 +50.5 Independent: Maggie Hickey: 953 49.5 +49.5 NT Nationals gain from Country Liberal: Swing: This election was declared void by the Court of Disputed Returns. 1987 Barkly by-election; Party Candidate Votes % ±% NT Nationals: Ian Tuxworth: 1,000 42.0 +42.0 Labor: Maggie Hickey: 886 37.2 -2.5 mock same method with different parametersWebbA general election was held in the Northern Territory, Australia on Saturday 3 December 1983. The result was a landslide victory for the incumbent Country Liberal Party (CLP) under Chief Minister Paul Everingham over the Australian Labor Party (ALP) opposition under Opposition leader Bob Collins . For this election, the size of the assembly was ... in line sprayer replacement bottleWebb5 feb. 2024 · Mr Tuxworth, who died in Perth on Tuesday January 21 aged 77, had a distinguished career in politics as a member of the Country Liberal Party and then … mock rum and coke